+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 29, 2008 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 24, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 23, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:42 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate second read
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:30 amobject
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 23, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
March 10, 2008: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 4, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 24
January 31, 2008: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
January 31, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor