+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Held
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Farley
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Lesko
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Lesko Floor amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
3-8 fin_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Lesko Floor amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-6 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
February 29, 2012: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 28, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 2
January 18, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
January 18, 2012: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor