+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading on reconsideration
- Representative kern moved that the House reconsider hb2629 on thursday, march 12th, 2015. motion passed by v/v
- Motion
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
- Third read: Failed
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Votes (3)
March 11, 2015: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 1
February 11, 2015: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
February 11, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor