+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 11, 2010 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 327
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 29, 2010 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 27, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Gray C flr amend (ref JUD)
On April 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On April 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 3:26 pm
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Gray C flr amend (ref JUD) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
4-6 jud_strikermemo_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Gray C flr amend (ref JUD) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-2 jud_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 28, 2010: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
April 27, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
March 15, 2010: Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
March 8, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 2
February 1, 2010: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 1, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor