+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Retirement and Rural Development: Do pass
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Retirement and Rural Development
On June 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On June 16, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: TI
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Transportation and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Transportation and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
2629rrd
Senate Fact Sheet
Transportation and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
June 17, 2009: Retirement and Rural Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
June 16, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 9
February 12, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 12, 2009: Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor