+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 2, 2009 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to RULES - Gowan
- Amendment: RULES
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Gowan Substitute Floor amendment to the Rules Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
Gowan Substitute Floor amendment to the Rules Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
2628ed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
February 19, 2009: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 19, 2009: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8