+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On July 13, 2009 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 173 erfeir
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 29, 2009 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Rfeir action sections
- Y passed
On June 25, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On June 22, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
- Rfeir action sections
- Y passed
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: C. Gray flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Paton flr amend (ref Bill)
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Judiciary: Do pass
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 9, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Rfeir action sections
- Y passed 1
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: JUD
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (11)
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Paton Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Paton Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Paton Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Paton Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
2627jud_as passed by the senate
Senate Fact Sheet
6-24 jud_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
6-15 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
June 29, 2009: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 6
June 22, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
June 12, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
June 9, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
February 12, 2009: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 12, 2009: Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 12, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8