+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 271
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 11, 2012 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pmobject
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: WM
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Proposed Amendment
3-6 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 10, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
February 29, 2012: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 28, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 3
January 18, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
January 18, 2012: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor