+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 11, 2010 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 326
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 29, 2010 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Antenori flr amend (ref Bill)
On April 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 5:10 pmobject
On March 31, 2010 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On March 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 3:26 pm
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Withdrawn
On February 3, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Antenori flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Antenori flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
6-1 fin_asenacted
Senate Fact Sheet
3-29 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 28, 2010: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 11
March 17, 2010: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
March 8, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 2
February 2, 2010: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 2, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor