+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On July 7, 2008 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On June 26, 2008 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 25, 2008 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On June 23, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Motion to amend 1
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment failed: McCune Davis flr amend (ref Bill) Page 1, lines 1-4 adopted--Page 1, lines 5-28, Pages 2 and 3
- Committee of the Whole:
- Motion to amend 1
- Committee of the Whole:
- Motion to amend 2
- Motion to amend 2
On June 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On May 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On March 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Senate second read
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: NRPS
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to NRPS - Pearce
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Natural Resources and Public Safety: Do pass amended
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Public Safety
- House first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Natural Resources and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
McCune Davis Floor Amendment; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
7-9_asvetoed
Senate Fact Sheet
Pearce substitute floor amendment to the Natural Resources and Public Safety committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
4-1pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
6-25 as passed senate
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
June 26, 2008: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 24
June 23, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 7
March 12, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 1
February 19, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 13, 2008: Natural Resources and Public Safety: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor