+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
On March 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Education: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Finance
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment substituted: WM
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to WM - Lesko
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (9)
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Lesko Substitute Floor amendment to the Ways and Means Committee amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Lesko Substitute Floor amendment to the Ways and Means Committee amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-9 fin_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 29, 2012: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 6
March 26, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
March 5, 2012: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 29, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 5
January 18, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
January 18, 2012: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor