+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 273 e
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Pierce flr amend (ref Bill)
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment substituted: EENR
- Amendment passed: SUB Floor Amend to EENR - Fann
- Amendment withdrawn: SUB Floor Amend to Fann SUB Floor Amend to EENR - Olson
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Energy, Environment and Natural Resources: Do pass amended
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Energy, Environment and Natural Resources
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (10)
Energy, Environment and Natural Resources
House Proposed Amendment
Pierce flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Energy, Environment and Natural Resources
House Adopted Amendment
Fann SUBSTITUTE Floor amendment to the ENERGY, ENVIORNMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES Committee amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Energy, Environment and Natural Resources
House Proposed Amendment
Pierce flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Fann SUBSTITUTE Floor amendment to the ENERGY, ENVIORNMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES Committee amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Energy, Environment and Natural Resources
House Adopted Amendment
4-17 approp_aspassedcow
Senate Fact Sheet
3-11 approp-ge
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (8)
April 23, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
April 23, 2014: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 6
March 10, 2014: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 10, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
March 5, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
February 11, 2014: Energy, Environment and Natural Resources: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 11, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 11, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (60)
Type:
Primary Sponsor