+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 1, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 150
- Action: Signed
On April 29, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 28, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:20 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 10, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: NRPS
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Natural Resources and Public Safety: Do pass amended
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Public Safety
- House first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Natural Resources and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
3-27 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
Natural Resources and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 28, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 4
March 11, 2008: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
March 10, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
January 31, 2008: Natural Resources and Public Safety: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
January 31, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor