+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: held.
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee: held.
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Floor Amend to bill - Chavez - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Placed on the consent calendar at 8:55AM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Local and International Affairs Committee: do pass.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Local and International Affairs Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 22, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 1
February 6, 2018: House Local and International Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 6, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6