+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 13, 2009 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 148
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On June 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 22, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On June 16, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: HHS - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to HHS - Murphy
On June 9, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
Health and Human Services - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Murphy Floor Amendment, reference to the Health and Human Services Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Murphy Floor Amendment, reference to the Health and Human Services Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
2622pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
June 26, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
June 23, 2009: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 22, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
February 19, 2009: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 19, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor