+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee: do pass.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Larkin - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: withdrawn.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
Floor Amend to Bill - Larkin - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 7, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
March 7, 2016: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
March 7, 2016: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 7, 2016: Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 6
March 2, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
March 2, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 5
February 8, 2016: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 8, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 8, 2016: House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
February 8, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor