+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 126
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
On March 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Lesko
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:15 amobject
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Lesko Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Lesko Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 28, 2012: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 26, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 27, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
January 17, 2012: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 17, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor