+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: Passed
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- ED (ref Bill)
- Dial flr amend (ref Bill) (sub ED) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- ED (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: failed.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (5)
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Dial flr amend (ref Bill) (sub ED) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 4, 2016: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 4, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 6
May 3, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
May 3, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
March 7, 2016: Education: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
March 7, 2016: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
March 3, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 1
March 3, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
February 10, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 10, 2016: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
February 10, 2016: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 10, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor