+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 18, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Chapter: 53
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Verschoor flr amend (ref APPROP)
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment withdrawn: NRRA (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment: Burns flr amend (ref APPROP) excluded by amending COW report
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Amendment failed: Cheuvront flr amend (ref APPROP)
- Motion to amend 1
- Motion to amend 1
- Committee of the Whole:
- Third read: Passed
On April 17, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On March 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: ENV
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Environment: Do pass amended
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Environment
- House first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Verschoor Floor Amendment; reference to APPROP amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Adopted Amendment
Environment
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-17 nrra-approp
Senate Fact Sheet
3-21 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
4-18 as enacted
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 17, 2008: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
April 17, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 4
February 19, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 13, 2008: Environment: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor