+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 39
- Action: Signed
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
- Senate second read
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- House first read
+ − Amendment
3-7 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 9, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
March 10, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
March 5, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
February 12, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 2
February 12, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor