+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Final reading in House: FAILED
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Transmit to House.
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Fann flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- House concurred.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
May 27, 2019: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 53
May 27, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
March 4, 2019: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 28, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 2
February 12, 2019: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
February 12, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8