+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Transmit to House
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Yarbrough flr amend (ref Bill) (sub RULES)
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate first read
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to WM - Olson
- Amendment: WM
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
+ − Amendments (14)
Ways and Means
House Proposed Amendment
Yarbrough flr amend (ref Bill) (sub RULES) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Olson SUBSTITUTE Floor amendment to the WAYS AND MEANS Committee amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Olson SUBSTITUTE Floor amendment to the WAYS AND MEANS Committee amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Yarbrough flr amend (ref Bill) (sub RULES) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
June 13, 2013: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
March 12, 2013: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
March 7, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 1
February 12, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 12, 2013: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor