+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 11, 2010 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 309
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 27, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 23, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Allen S flr amend (ref Bill) (sub NRIPD)
On April 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On April 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass amended
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 23, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: NRRA
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to NRRA - Jones
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 25, 2010 in the House:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (13)
Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Allen S flr amend (ref Bill) (sub NRIPD) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Jones Substitute Floor amendment to the Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
Jones Substitute Floor amendment to the Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
House Adopted Amendment
Allen S flr amend (ref Bill) (sub NRIPD) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
HB2617_ASPASSED.DOC
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 27, 2010: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 3
April 22, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
March 25, 2010: Natural Resources, Infrastructure and Public Debt: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
March 23, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 5
January 28, 2010: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
January 28, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor