+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: Passed
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- FIN (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee: do pass.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- FSR - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Gowan - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Federalism and States' Rights Committee: do pass amended.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Federalism and States' Rights Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (8)
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Federalism and States' Rights
House Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Gowan - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Federalism and States' Rights
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (16)
March 14, 2016: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 2
March 14, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 16
March 10, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
March 10, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2016: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
February 18, 2016: Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 18, 2016: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
February 18, 2016: Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 18, 2016: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
February 18, 2016: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 17, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 14
February 17, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 14
February 4, 2016: Federalism and States' Rights: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
February 4, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 4, 2016: House Federalism and States' Rights Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 4, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor