+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 147
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Miscellaneous motion
- Hb 2616 substituted for sb 1448 on third reading.
On June 22, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Third read: Passed
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 11, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 28, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: HHS - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to HHS - Murphy
On April 21, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 13, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Health and Human Services - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Murphy Floor amendment, reference to the Health and Human Services Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Murphy Floor amendment, reference to the Health and Human Services Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
June 22, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
June 11, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
February 19, 2009: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
February 19, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor