+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 24, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Failed
- Motion
- Representative hendrix moved that the House reconsider hb 2615 on monday, june 29, 2009. motion passed by v/v.
- Final disposition: Failed in House on third reading
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Montenegro
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Montenegro Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Montenegro Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
June 24, 2009: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 31
- Present/NV: 5
February 19, 2009: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 19, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8