+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Yarbrough flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee: do pass.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Kern - passed
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: do pass.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (4)
Yarbrough flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Kern - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 5, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 16
May 5, 2016: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 4
April 11, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
April 11, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
March 7, 2016: Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
March 7, 2016: Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 2, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 11
March 2, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
February 8, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
February 8, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 8, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
February 8, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor