+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Plumlee - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- House County and Municipal Affairs Committee: do pass.
- Second read in House.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House County and Municipal Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
Floor Amend to Bill - Plumlee - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 23
March 3, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 3
February 11, 2016: County and Municipal Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
February 11, 2016: House County and Municipal Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
February 11, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 11, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Celeste Plumlee
Type:
Primary Sponsor