+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Thorpe
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Thorpe Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Thorpe Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-13 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 15, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
March 10, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
March 6, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
February 11, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
February 11, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor