+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
On May 11, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 23, 2009 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Withdrawn
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (2)
February 19, 2009: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
February 19, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2