+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 13, 2009 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 123
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 22, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 10, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: RULES
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to RULES - Biggs
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On April 6, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Biggs Substitute Floor amendment to the Rules Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
Biggs Substitute Floor amendment to the Rules Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
6-15 pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
June 22, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
June 12, 2009: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 10, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 19, 2009: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 19, 2009: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor