+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 6, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On June 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On June 23, 2022 in the House:
- Final reading in House: PASSED
- House concurred.
On May 25, 2022 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- HHS (ref Bill) adopted
- Fann flr amend (ref HHS) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended.
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Burges - passed
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 9:05AM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
June 23, 2022: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 1
May 18, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 25
March 9, 2022: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 2, 2022: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
February 3, 2022: House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
February 3, 2022: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor