+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 289
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Nelson flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:35 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Transportation: Do pass
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Transportation
- Senate first read
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: TRANS
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to TRANS - JP Weiers
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass amended
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- House first read
+ − Amendments (9)
Nelson flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Transportation
House Proposed Amendment
Transportation
House Adopted Amendment
Jerry Weiers Substitute Floor Amendment to the Transportation Committee Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation
House Proposed Amendment
Jerry Weiers Substitute Floor Amendment to the Transportation Committee Amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Nelson flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Transportation
House Adopted Amendment
3-11 nrt
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 20, 2011: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 20, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 10
March 8, 2011: Natural Resources and Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
March 7, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
February 7, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 7, 2011: Transportation: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1