+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 293
- Action: Signed
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to House
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Government: Do pass
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Mesnard
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Elections: Do pass
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Elections
- House first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Elections
House Proposed Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Mesnard - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 30, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2015: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 25, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 2
February 5, 2015: Elections: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
February 5, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor