+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 19, 2010 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 93
- Action: Signed
On April 13, 2010 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 12, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 3:05 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 30, 2010 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass
On March 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 3:55 pm
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
+ − Amendment
3-26 ced
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 12, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
March 17, 2010: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2
March 11, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
January 28, 2010: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 28, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2