+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 272
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Yee flr amend (ref Bill)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Yee flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Yee flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-15 ed-ge_aspassedcow
Senate Fact Sheet
3-11 ed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
April 23, 2014: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 6
April 22, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 3, 2014: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 3
March 3, 2014: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 27, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
February 11, 2014: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 11, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor