+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 9:50AM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (2)
January 30, 2020: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 30, 2020: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor