+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: HEALTH
- Amendment passed: SUB Floor Amend to HEALTH - Cobb
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Health: Do pass amended
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Health
House Proposed Amendment
SUB Floor Amend to HEALTH - Cobb - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Health
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 11, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 5, 2015: Health: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
February 5, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2