+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 9:50AM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- House State & International Affairs Committee: do pass.
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House State & International Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2020: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 19
January 30, 2020: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 30, 2020: House State & International Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor