+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 157
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Hobbs flr amend (ref Bill)
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Senator Hobbs moved the portion of the Committee of the Whole report that House Bill 2603 do pass be amended to show the bill retained on the calendar. The motion carried.
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Reform and Human Services: Do pass
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Reform and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
3-18 hhs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 17, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
March 10, 2014: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 6, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 2
February 11, 2014: Reform and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
February 11, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor