+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 246
- Action: Signed
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Borrelli
- Amendment passed: RULES
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Floor Amend to Bill Borrelli passed
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 31, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2015: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 10, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 1
February 9, 2015: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
February 9, 2015: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor