+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 28, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 117
On April 22, 2008 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 21, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Gray C flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 11:54 amobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Senate first read
On March 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 10, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: HS
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to HS - Hershberger
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Human Services: Do pass amended
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Human Services
- House first read
+ − Amendments (9)
Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Gray C Floor Amendmet; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Hershberger Substitute Floor amendment to the Human Services Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Gray C Floor Amendmet; reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
4-11 caucus-floor revised
Senate Fact Sheet
Hershberger Substitute Floor amendment to the Human Services Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
4-22 as passed senate
Senate Fact Sheet
3-18 pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 22, 2008: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
April 21, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2008: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 10, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
January 31, 2008: Human Services: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
January 31, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1