+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- RULES (ref Bill) withdrawn
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Amended by COM - passed
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 8:55AM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 9, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
March 1, 2018: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 21, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 8
February 6, 2018: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 6, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor