+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 7, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 165
- Action: Signed
On May 5, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On May 1, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On May 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:42 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On March 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: GOV
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
3-26 pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
May 1, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
March 19, 2008: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
March 18, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 28, 2008: Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 28, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3