+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: PASSED
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- TAT (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass amended.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Cobb - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:55PM.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
May 5, 2021: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 60
May 3, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
March 3, 2021: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 1, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
January 28, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
January 28, 2021: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor