+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 7, 2012 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 307 e
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 30, 2012 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Nelson flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pmobject
On March 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Veterans, Military and Government Affairs: Do pass
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Veterans, Military and Government Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Judd
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Technology and Infrastructure: Do pass
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Technology and Infrastructure
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Nelson flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judd Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Nelson flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judd Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-12 vmga-approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
April 30, 2012: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
April 18, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
March 6, 2012: Veterans, Military and Government Affairs: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
March 6, 2012: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 3
March 5, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
January 18, 2012: Technology and Infrastructure: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 1
January 18, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2