+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee: do pass.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Ackerley - passed
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House Banking and Financial Services Committee: do pass.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Banking and Financial Services Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
Floor Amend to Bill - Ackerley - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
May 5, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
May 5, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
March 7, 2016: Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee
- Yeas: 6
March 7, 2016: Commerce and Workforce Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 3
March 3, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
March 3, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 2
February 8, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 8, 2016: House Banking and Financial Services Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 8, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 8, 2016: Banking and Financial Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor