+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 185
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Farnsworth flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pmobject
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Financial Institutions: Do pass
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Weninger
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Banking and Financial Services: Do pass
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Banking and Financial Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Farnsworth flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Weninger - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 30, 2015: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
March 24, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 4, 2015: Financial Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
March 3, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
February 3, 2015: Banking and Financial Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 3, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor