+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 20, 2008 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 220
- Action: Signed
On May 14, 2008 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Transmit to House
On May 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On May 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On May 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 12:36 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On April 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On March 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 26, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 24, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to WM - Crandall
- Amendment: WM
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 19, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended
On January 30, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Crandall Substitute Floor amendment to the Ways and Means Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Crandall Substitute Floor amendment to the Ways and Means Committee amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
4-7 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
May 14, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
March 31, 2008: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
March 26, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
January 29, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
January 29, 2008: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor