+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- Conference committee recommended.
- House Minority Caucus.
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
- House concurred.
- Final reading in House: Passed
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Borrelli flr amend (ref Bill) (sub GOV) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass amended.
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Amended by COM - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 8:55AM.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass amended.
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
May 3, 2018: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 6
May 3, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 3
March 1, 2018: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 21, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 9
February 6, 2018: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
February 6, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor